CT HB06268 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 520
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - File Number 520
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require vision screening for young children.
Title
An Act Concerning Pediatric Vision Screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 520 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 326 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |