CT HB06235 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To create a task force to (1) examine procedural problems with addressing blight at the municipal level, (2) create model blight ordinances, and (3) propose legislative solutions to allow municipalities to more effectively address blight in their communities.
Title
An Act Creating A State-wide Task Force To Address Blight And Concerning Notice Of Fines, Penalties, Costs Or Fees For Citations Issued Under Municipal Ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 450 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 79 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-132 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 515 |
2013-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-17 | House | File Number 548 |
2013-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 344 |
2013-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-07 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |