CT HB06212 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - File Number 217
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - File Number 217
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a paid family and medical leave system in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning Earned Family And Medical Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | File Number 217 |
2017-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-03 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |