CT HB06176 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the penalty for violation of the personnel files to five hundred dollars per violation related to an individual employee and one thousand dollars for subsequent violations related to an individual employee.
Title
An Act Concerning Increasing Penalties For Repeat Violators Of The Personnel Files Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-05-18 | Public Act 11-12 | |
2011-05-12 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Senate Calendar Number 102 | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed | |
2011-03-07 | File Number 35 | |
2011-03-07 | House Calendar Number 41 | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-02-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-02-08 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |