CT HB06132 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 225
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - File Number 225
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide emergency backup electrical power in public housing for the elderly.
Title
An Act Concerning Emergency Power In Public Housing For The Elderly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 225 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 156 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |
2015-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2015-01-29 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |