CT HB06106 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To revise the property tax exemption for certain renewable energy sources and hydropower facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Property Tax Exemption For Certain Renewable Energy Sources And Hydropower Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 387 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 414 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 414 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-180 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-08 | House | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9885 |
2021-05-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 439 |
2021-05-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-12 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-17 | House | File Number 69 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Calendar Number 88 |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-01-29 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |