CT HB06105 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - File Number 49
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To grant access to original birth records to all adopted persons eighteen years of age or older who were born in Connecticut regardless of date of birth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Access To Original Birth Certificates By Adult Adopted Persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseFile Number 49
2021-03-16HouseHouse Calendar Number 72
2021-03-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-03-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-03HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-02HouseJoint Favorable
2021-01-29HousePublic Hearing 02/03
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback