CT HB06050 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-03 - File Number 895
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-03 - File Number 895
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To develop the creative economy of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Development Of The Creative Economy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | File Number 895 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Calendar Number 637 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-02 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-02 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6744 | |
2011-05-11 | File Number 785 | |
2011-05-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-25 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 177 | |
2011-03-23 | House Calendar Number 114 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-09 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-08 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-24 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Commerce | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-22 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Commerce | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |