CT HB06047 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 678
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 678
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To differentiate voting districts' ballots by color when multiple voting districts are served by a single polling place.
Title
An Act Concerning Ballots Used At Polling Places That Serve Multiple Voting Districts.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Philip Young [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 678 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 414 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-03-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-06 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |