CT HB06022 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To consider the development of thermal energy transportation company facilities in the city of Bridgeport.
Title
An Act Concerning Thermal Energy Transportation Companies In The City Of Bridgeport.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2015-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06022-R00-HB.htm |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06022-R01-HB.htm |