CT HB05965 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To provide low cost training to local law enforcement officers on issues of domestic violence prevention.
Title
An Act Concerning Sensitivity And Awareness Training For Local Law Enforcement Officials.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-03-14 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-03-14 | House | Change of Reference Public Safety and Security |
2013-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2013-02-15 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05965&which_year=2013 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2013/TOB/H/2013HB-05965-R00-HB.htm |