CT HB05925 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To specify that underwriting rules and regulations used by an insurance company for automobile and homeowners insurance policies are considered trade secrets.
Title
An Act Concerning The Confidentiality Of Automobile Liability Insurance Underwriting Guidelines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-28 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-02-22 | House | File Number 6 |
2013-02-22 | House | House Calendar Number 34 |
2013-02-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/21/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-01-25 | House | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |