CT HB05883 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - File Number 987
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - File Number 987
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that each workers' compensation insurance policy in this state provide coverage for detoxification for each injured employee who, as a result of a covered injury sustained by such employee, consumes opioid drugs for a continuous period of not less than one year.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Insurance Coverage For Detoxification For Certain Injured Employees, Local And Regional Board Of Education Employee Notices And Reimbursement Of Lost Wages For Appearance At A Deposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 186 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | File Number 987 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Calendar Number 604 |
2019-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-22 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9396 |
2019-04-08 | House | File Number 468 |
2019-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 293 |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-19 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |