CT HB05871 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - File Number 385
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - File Number 385
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enable soil and water conservation districts to establish fees for the technical assistance services they provide to municipal and regional agencies and private landowners.
Title
An Act Providing Funding For Soil And Water Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | File Number 385 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 280 |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |