CT HB05818 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit applicants in line for election day registration prior to eight o'clock p.m. to be admitted as electors and cast a vote in a regular election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Hours Of Election Day Registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback