CT HB05767 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require individual insurance policies to cover refills of prescription drugs made in accordance with a plan to synchronize refilling multiple prescriptions for certain insured persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Synchronizing Prescription Refills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 469 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 35 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 35 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-131 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 348 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | File Number 76 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Calendar Number 74 |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-14 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate |
2013-01-28 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |