CT HB05747 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To improve recovery rates and maintain family connections by allocating bond funds for the acquisition or rental of supportive sober housing for parents attending Redemption Song, Inc.'s Dry Dock recovery program in Wallingford.
Title
An Act Concerning Bonding To Benefit Redemption Song, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-18 | House | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2013-02-15 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-02-04 | House | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05747&which_year=2013 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2013/TOB/H/2013HB-05747-R00-HB.htm |