CT HB05654 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide "good samaritan" protection to any individual who enters the vehicle of another to rescue a child that he or she believes is in imminent danger.
Title
An Act Concerning "good Samaritan" Protection For Those Entering Cars To Aid Children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | House | File Number 21 |
2015-03-05 | House | House Calendar Number 48 |
2015-03-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |