CT HB05653 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To update our civil preparedness and public health emergency statutes and executive order emergency powers to reflect emerging threats, and to retain a legislative role in defining the duration of such powers.
Title
An Act Concerning Declarations Of Public Health And Civil Preparedness Emergencies And The Creation Of A Bipartisan Commission To Study Statutes Governing The Issuance Of Such Declarations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 101 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Special Act 21-5 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-05-13 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 420 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-11 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8334 |
2021-04-22 | House | File Number 571 |
2021-04-22 | House | House Calendar Number 398 |
2021-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-19 | House | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-17 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |