CT HB05616 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 444
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) redact the month and day of an individual's date of birth when a list prepared under title 9 of the general statutes is disclosed pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act and prohibit publication of any such list on the Internet web site by the person having requested such list pursuant to said act, (2) require that certain meeting notices are electronically filed with the Secretary of the State and posted on an Internet web site designated by said Secretary, and (3) allow for notice of special and reconvened sessions to be sent electronically.
Title
An Act Concerning Notices And Public Information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 60 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 444 |
2016-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | File Number 571 |
2016-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 354 |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |