CT HB05584 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide resources for small businesses to assist their sustainability and growth.
Title
An Act Concerning The Creation Of A Small Business Hotline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 424 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-19 | House | Public Act 17-158 |
2017-06-07 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-05 | House | File Number 724 |
2017-05-05 | House | Senate Calendar Number 407 |
2017-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6525 |
2017-04-04 | House | File Number 382 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 277 |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2017-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |