CT HB05534 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - File Number 474
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - File Number 474
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Developmental Services to provide certain services to individuals with intellectual disabilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Services To Individuals With Intellectual Disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | File Number 474 |
2014-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 282 |
2014-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |