CT HB05502 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 605
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 605
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) amend provisions concerning the bonding authority of the Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority, (2) require state actors to notify the Treasurer of reportable financial obligations and agreements, (3) require the prior approval of the Treasurer for certain transactions, and (4) delete provisions concerning the Tax-Exempt Proceeds Funds.
Title
An Act Concerning The Operations Of The State Treasurer And The Bonding Authority Of The Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | File Number 605 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 468 |
2022-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/30 |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |