CT HB05499 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 518
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 518
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the criminal laws of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Criminal Laws Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | File Number 518 |
2024-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 356 |
2024-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |