CT HB05497 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee concerning modification of the continuing education requirements for audiologists and hearing instrument specialists.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee Concerning The Regulation Of Hearing Instrument Specialists And Audiologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 378 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 217 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 217 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-110 | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-05 | File Number 651 | |
2012-05-05 | Senate Calendar Number 502 | |
2012-05-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-04 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-04 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-04 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4175 | |
2012-04-10 | File Number 321 | |
2012-04-10 | House Calendar Number 262 | |
2012-04-10 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-03-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-16 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |
2012-03-09 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |