CT HB05494 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish standards for proposed charter and home rule ordinance amendment ballot questions designed to increase clarity and simplicity for voters, and (2) provide for review, and approval or disapproval, of such ballot questions by the Secretary of the State.
Title
An Act Concerning Referenda On Revisions To Municipal Charters And Home Rule Ordinances.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Sen. Derek Slap [D] | Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | File Number 490 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 340 |
2024-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |