CT HB05483 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a Division of Fire Services Administration within the Department of Emergency Services and Public Protection, (2) transfer the functions of the Office of the State Fire Administrator, the Office of the State Fire Marshal and the Office of Education and Data Administration within the Department of Administrative Services to the division, and (3) revise the powers and duties of the Commission on Fire Prevention and Control, and revise the membership of the commission.
Title
An Act Establishing And Transferring Various Functions To A Division Of Fire Services Administration Within The Department Of Emergency Services And Public Protection, Revising The Powers And Composition Of The Commission On Fire Prevention And Control And Establishing A Working Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 323 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 104 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 104 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-136 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-02 | Senate | File Number 653 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 411 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4986 |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 291 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 208 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |