CT HB05480 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require towns to provide Internet service to the offices of the registrars of voters, to clarify that any declaratory ruling, instruction or opinion issued by the Secretary of the State binding upon registrars of voters and town clerks and enforceable by the State Elections Enforcement Commission and to provide requirements for the form of any such written instruction or opinion, and to require the posting of the state's law concerning identification for voting requirements at each polling place.
Title
An Act Concerning Registrars Of Voters, The Authority Of The Secretary Of The State And The State Elections Enforcement Commission, And The Posting Of Requirements For Voter Identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 422 |
2014-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | File Number 409 |
2014-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 244 |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |