CT HB05462 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To honor Connecticut citizens who perform extraordinary acts of heroism.
Title
An Act Creating A Civilian Medal Of Honor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-27 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2017-01-27 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2017-01-26 | House | Change of Reference to Public Safety and Security |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |