CT HB05457 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 260
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To increase the handling fee paid to redemption centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Bottle Redemption Centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseFile Number 260
2018-04-05HouseHouse Calendar Number 193
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-05HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09HousePublic Hearing 03/16
2018-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback