CT HB05438 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal obsolete statutory provisions concerning workshops for persons with disabilities formerly administered by the Department of Rehabilitation Services.
Title
An Act Deleting Obsolete Statutory Provisions Concerning Workshops For People With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 406 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 89 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 410 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 89 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-118 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-25 | House | File Number 724 |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 499 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3626 |
2016-03-23 | House | File Number 150 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 132 |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |