CT HB05433 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Motion Failed JF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To adjust the premium tax liability offset of assessments paid by insurance companies to the Connecticut Insurance Guaranty Association and the Connecticut Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association.
Title
An Act Adjusting Insurance Guaranty Fund Credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Motion Failed JF | |
2010-04-05 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-03-25 | File Number 156 | |
2010-03-25 | House Calendar Number 110 | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |