CT HB05426 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the town clerk of a municipality to designate an election day registration location when the registrars of voters of such municipality fail to agree on such a location.
Title
An Act Concerning Election Day Registration Locations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 383 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 222 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 18-119 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 521 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 443 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 314 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |