CT HB05408 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Calendar Number 373
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Calendar Number 373
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize municipalities that spay or neuter and vaccinate unclaimed dogs to charge any person who adopts an unclaimed dog the cost of such treatments.
Title
An Act Concerning Adoption Fees For Dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 67 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | House Passed | |
2012-04-11 | File Number 352 | |
2012-04-11 | House Calendar Number 278 | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-04 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-26 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-05 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |