CT HB05393 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - House Rejected Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - House Rejected Bill
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To limit the ability of tax assessors to increase or decrease gross property tax assessments following the modification of any such assessments.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Adjustments To Gross Assessments Of Taxable Real Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 205 (Y: 64 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | House Rejected Bill |
2024-04-10 | House | File Number 411 |
2024-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 267 |
2024-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |