CT HB05393 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish an account for payment of each twenty-seventh payroll. Requested by the State Comptroller.
Title
An Act Concerning The Establishment Of An Account To Fund The Twenty-seventh State Payroll Period.
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Rep. Ernest Hewett [D] | Rep. Linda Schofield [D] |
Sen. Donald Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 415 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-25 | Public Act 10-173 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Calendar Number 516 | |
2010-04-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-28 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2010-04-28 | House Passed | |
2010-04-13 | File Number 492 | |
2010-04-13 | House Calendar Number 294 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |