CT HB05392 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - No New File by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - No New File by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement requirements for meteorological tower markings.
Title
An Act Concerning Airports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 367 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 241 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |