CT HB05388 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of issues concerning homeless female veterans.
Title
An Act Concerning Homeless Female Veterans And Bilingual Service Officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-04-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-04-29 | Public Act 10-21 | |
2010-04-21 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Calendar Number 421 | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | House Passed | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 369 | |
2010-04-07 | House Calendar Number 202 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |
2010-02-26 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs |