CT HB05386 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To place a cap on costs for epinephrine cartridge injectors.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Epinephrine Cartridge Injectors, Health Carriers And Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 55 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | File Number 580 |
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 419 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4852 |
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | House | File Number 374 |
2022-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 264 |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |