CT HB05386 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To reduce the incidence of chronic disease in the state and improve chronic care coordination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Care Coordination For Chronic Disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 419 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 AS AMENDED (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-05-22HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2014-05-21HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2014-05-20HousePublic Act 14-148
2014-05-07HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2014-05-07HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-07HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-28HouseFile Number 699
2014-04-28HouseSenate Calendar Number 512
2014-04-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-25HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-25HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4383
2014-03-25HouseFile Number 95
2014-03-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 73
2014-03-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-03-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2014-02-28HousePublic Hearing 03/05
2014-02-26HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback