CT HB05386 | 2013 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Referred by House to Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To provide a preference for individuals who meet the federal veterans' preference requirements in the award of units in low rent housing projects overseen by municipal housing authorities and the Connecticut Housing Authority, and in the award of rental assistance available through the Department of Social Services for low-income families living in privately-owned rental housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Housing Assistance For Veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03HouseReferred by House to Committee on Housing
2013-03-26HouseFile Number 162
2013-03-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 125
2013-03-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2013-03-26HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-19HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
2013-03-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2013-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2013-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
2013-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2013-02-22HouseVote to Draft
2013-02-14HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2013-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2013-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback