CT HB05378 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Matter Pass Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include security services in the definition of "building, property or equipment service" and to classify housekeeping aides as light cleaners for the purposes of the standard wage and to index the standard rate of wages to the consumer price index.
Title
An Act Concerning The Standard Rate Of Wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 136 AS AMENDED (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 5837 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | Senate | File Number 741 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 521 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3647 |
2016-03-29 | House | File Number 235 |
2016-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 178 |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |