CT HB05369 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 283
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 283
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to prevent immediate loss of benefits in certain public assistance programs for persons who exceed income thresholds due to employment.
Title
An Act Concerning A Benefits Cliff Pilot Program.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Gary Turco [D] | Sen. Julie Kushner [D] | Rep. James Sanchez [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 283 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |