CT HB05367 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide Medicaid coverage for rapid whole genome sequencing of critically ill infants.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Coverage Of Rapid Whole Genome Sequencing For Critically Ill Infants And Studies Concerning The Elimination Or Reduction Of The Katie Beckett Waiver Program Waiting List And Medicaid Coverage Of Diapers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 306 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 190 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 190 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-22 | House | Public Act 24-130 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 475 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5826 |
2024-04-16 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 282 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 199 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |