CT HB05358 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require a certificate of insurance or self-insurance prior to the approval of any lease or use of any military facility, (2) permit the Adjutant General to allow the lease or use of any military facility at cost of operation, and (3) provide that proceeds generated from leases of certain military facilities be deposited into the Governor's Guards horse account.
Title
An Act Concerning The Leasing Of Military Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 315 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 319 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 319 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 16-52 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 516 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 72 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 89 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |