CT HB05356 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study the feasibility of establishing a pathways in technology early college high school program in alliance districts which would enroll students from surrounding towns.
Title
An Act Concerning Early College High School Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |