CT HB05339 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - File Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - File Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the time for the task force to study the distribution of state funds to municipalities to issue its report and to expand the membership of said task force.
Title
An Act Extending The Reporting Requirements For And Expanding The Membership Of The Task Force To Study The Distribution Of State Funds To Municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | File Number 481 | |
2012-04-17 | House Calendar Number 357 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-10 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |