CT HB05331 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Court Support Services Division of the Judicial Branch to conduct a survey of youths who interface with the court system or receive services through the Judicial Branch in order to ascertain the need for additional or improved services for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender and queer youths.
Title
An Act Requiring A Survey Of Court-involved Youths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |