CT HB05312 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Public Hearing 03/20
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Public Hearing 03/20
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase to one thousand dollars the individual qualifying contribution amount for state-wide office candidates under the Citizens' Election Program.
Title
An Act Concerning Qualifying Contribution Amounts To Participating State-wide Office Candidates Under The Citizens' Election Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-03-14 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |