CT HB05299 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - Senate Calendar Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent the manufacture, sale and distribution of children's products containing certain flame retardant chemicals.
Title
An Act Concerning Toxic Flame Retardant Chemicals In Children's Products And Upholstered Residential Furniture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 570 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5746 |
2016-03-23 | House | File Number 142 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 124 |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |